Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus Antonius de Esterházy

Deceased

Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1655BornKismartonie
8 Sep 168024.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 169236.7AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
1 Feb 1693³37.0Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
5 Aug 169539.5DiedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Antonius de Esterházy:
Bishop Nicolaus Antonius de Esterházy (born , died ) Bishop of Knin (Tinin)

  • a priest for 14.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 381
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015