Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques d’Angennes

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
5 May 160625.3AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
27 Aug 160625.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
16 May 164766.3DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques d’Angennes
Bishop Jacques d’Angennes (born 1581, died ) Bishop of Bayeux

  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast