Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Davy du Perron

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹BornVire
18 Dec 161752.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens, France
18 Dec 161752.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
22 Jul 161853.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
5 Sep 161853.6SucceededArchbishop of Sens, France
24 Oct 162156.8DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Davy du Perron:
Archbishop Jean Davy du Perron (died ) Archbishop of Sens

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 201, and Page 313
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015