Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista De Pace, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1627³BornNapoli
5 Jun 168457.0AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
11 Jun 168457.0Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
20 Nov 169871.4DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista De Pace:
Bishop Giovanni Battista De Pace C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 142
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015