Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Giulio Delfino

Deceased

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1634³Born
25 Oct 167137.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Oct 167137.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 168450.2AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
24 Jun 168450.2Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
24 Apr 168551.0DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pier Giulio Delfino
Bishop Pier Giulio Delfino (born , died ) Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRovigo

  • a priest for 13.4 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 231
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast