Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petar Dujam Maupas

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1813Born
6 Sep 183622.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Sep 183622.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Aug 185541.9SelectedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
20 Dec 185542.2ConfirmedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
25 Mar 185642.5Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
28 Feb 186248.4SelectedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
21 May 186248.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
8 Mar 189177.4DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Petar Dujam Maupas (VIAF: 305528709)
Archbishop Petar Dujam Maupas (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpalato
Ordained BishopZadar, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 315, and Page 517
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017