Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino-Maria de Mari

Deceased

Bishop of Savona e Noli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1794BornGenova
16 May 181823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
8 Dec 183238.1SelectedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
15 Apr 183338.4ConfirmedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
12 May 183338.5Ordained BishopBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
14 Dec 184046.1DiedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino-Maria de Mari
Bishop Agostino-Maria de Mari (born , died ) Bishop of Savona e Noli

  • a priest for 22.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016