Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Placido Maria Cardinal Tadini, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1759BornMontecalvo
21 Sep 178222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
13 Aug 182969.8SelectedBishop of Biella, Italy
28 Sep 182970.0ConfirmedBishop of Biella, Italy
18 Oct 182970.0Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
28 Oct 183172.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Genova, Italy
24 Apr 183272.5SelectedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
2 Jul 183272.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
6 Apr 183575.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Apr 183575.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
22 Nov 184788.1DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Placido Maria Tadini:
Cardinal Placido Maria Tadini O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
  • a cardinal for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 121, and Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013