Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nicholas Dinand, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Selinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1869Born
15 Aug 188010.6First VowsMember of Society of Jesus
25 Jun 190333.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 190636.6Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jul 192757.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
12 Jul 192757.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Selinus
30 Oct 192757.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selinus
4 Oct 192959.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
29 Jul 194373.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nicholas Dinand
Bishop Joseph Nicholas Dinand S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, MA, Diocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
Ordained PriestWoodstock College, Woodstock, MD
Ordained BishopHoly Cross College, Chapel, Worcester
Death PlaceWeston, MA

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1927, Number 68
  • firs/sole: CB, 4 Jun 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022