Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Vicente Silva Avilés y Olave Salaverría

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1747Born
1770²22.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
15 Mar 181567.9AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
26 Oct 181669.5DiedBishop-Elect of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Vicente Silva Avilés y Olave Salaverría
Father José Vicente Silva Avilés y Olave Salaverría (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuayaquil

  • a priest for 46.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 208
  • b: LB, 13 Jul 2013
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast