Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo de Obregón y Mena

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1708Born
13 Mar 175849.5AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
1760¹51.3Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
14 Jul 178576.8DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo de Obregón y Mena
Bishop Jerónimo de Obregón y Mena (born , died ) Bishop of Popayán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Peru

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 344
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast