Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cayetano Benítez de Lugo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jun 1739AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
2 Aug 1739Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
4 Sep 1739DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Benítez de Lugo:
Bishop Cayetano Benítez de Lugo O.P. (died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 59, Number 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013