Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcin Chyczewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Torone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1725³BornDaniszovicz
14 Oct 175327.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Dec 175328.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 178963.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
30 Mar 178963.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Torone
26 Jul 178963.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Torone
Nov 1793³67.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
23 Jun 179670.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcin Chyczewski
Bishop Marcin Chyczewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 411, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016