Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Michael Deliman

Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Sufes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1947 Born
19 May 197326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
31 May 201669.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
31 May 201669.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufes
18 Aug 201669.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufes

MicroData Summary for Edward Michael Deliman
Bishop Edward Michael Deliman (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLorain, OH
Ordained BishopSaints Peter and Paul, Cathedral Basilica, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Philadelphia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 31 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,075

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast