Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aloisio Grimani

Deceased

Archbishop of Candia


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1605AppointedArchbishop of Candia, Greece
16 Jan 1605Ordained BishopArchbishop of Candia, Greece
21 Feb 1620DiedArchbishop of Candia, Greece

MicroData Summary for Aloisio Grimani:
Archbishop Aloisio Grimani (died ) Archbishop of Candia

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 168
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 42, Number 226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013