Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Darnand, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa

Titular Bishop of Polemonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1879BornBény, France
16 Jul 190525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
4 Aug 191939.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
4 Aug 191939.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Polemonium
16 May 192040.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polemonium
1953²73.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Jun 196282.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Darnand:
Bishop Joseph Darnand S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: JPG
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013