Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro María Cubero López de Padilla

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1810Born
27 Sep 185847.9AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
27 Feb 185948.3Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
11 Nov 188171.0DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro María Cubero López de Padilla
Bishop Pedro María Cubero López de Padilla (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDoña Mencía, Diocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 427
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 167, Number 918
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,859, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast