Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alfonso Albuquerque Berión

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1797BornAguilas
1821¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 185457.2SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
23 Jun 185457.4ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
25 Mar 185558.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
1 Aug 185760.5SelectedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
25 Sep 185760.7ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
13 Mar 187477.2DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Alfonso Albuquerque Berión:
Bishop Juan Alfonso Albuquerque Berión (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 70, and Page 225
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 163, Number 896

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014