Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Casamassima

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Titular Bishop of Soli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1764Born
22 Sep 178722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
28 Feb 183166.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
28 Feb 183166.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Soli
10 Apr 183166.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Soli
184782.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Casamassima
Bishop Giuseppe Casamassima (born , died 1847) Auxiliary Bishop of Bari (-Canosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBari

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast