Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Siciliani

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Molfetta

Titular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1765BornGiovinazzo
19 Sep 178924.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 182862.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Molfetta, Italy
23 Jun 182862.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
25 Jul 182862.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
3 Jul 184882.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Molfetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Siciliani
Bishop Ferdinando Siciliani (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Molfetta

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 378
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016