Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arcangelo Maria Luc Thomas Ciccarelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ugento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1671Born
1 May 169423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Jan 173159.9SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
30 Apr 173160.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
3 May 173160.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
3 Jun 173867.3SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ugento, Italy
19 Dec 173867.8ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ugento, Italy
11 Feb 174775.9ResignedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arcangelo Maria Luc Thomas Ciccarelli
Archbishop Arcangelo Maria Luc Thomas Ciccarelli O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ugento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltamura

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 251, and Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast