Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Francesco Cardinal Sanvitale

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1660BornParma
27 Dec 169939.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 170343.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
22 Jul 170343.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
15 Apr 170949.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
6 May 170949.2AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
22 Jul 170949.4Elevated to Cardinal
9 Sep 170949.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
17 Dec 171454.9DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Francesco Sanvitale:
Antonio Francesco Cardinal Sanvitale (born , died ) Archbishop of Urbino

  • a priest for 15.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
  • a cardinal for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1709
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Sep 2014