Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Crisostomo Verchio, O.S.B.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montemarano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1673Born
22 Sep 169623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
6 May 172046.6AppointedBishop of Montemarano, Italy
12 May 172046.6Ordained BishopBishop of Montemarano, Italy
9 Jul 172652.8DiedBishop of Montemarano, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Crisostomo Verchio
Bishop Giovanni Crisostomo Verchio O.S.B.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Montemarano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRossano

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast