Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fulvio Crivelli (Cribelli)

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornNapoli
1 Sep 166628.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Sep 166628.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 168446.3AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
1 May 168446.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
1685¹47.0DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fulvio Crivelli (Cribelli):
Bishop Fulvio Crivelli (Cribelli) (born 1638, died 1685) Bishop of Tricarico

  • a priest for 18.2 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 388
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015