Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás Vidal y de Nin, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1669³BornTarragona, Spain
20 Dec 169222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
29 Jul 173060.5SelectedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
11 Sep 173060.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
21 Sep 173060.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
Jun 1743³73.4DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Vidal y de Nin:
Archbishop Tomás Vidal y de Nin O. Cist. (born , died Jun 1743) Archbishop of Messina

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 49, Number 200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015