Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damián Francisco Cornejo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1629Born
13 Sep 169464.9AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
7 Nov 169465.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
17 Nov 170677.1ResignedBishop of Orense, Spain
28 Apr 170777.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for Damián Francisco Cornejo
Bishop Damián Francisco Cornejo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalencia, Diocese of Palencia

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 236, Number 1,465
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast