Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Binkentios Coressi

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

Titular Archbishop of Sardes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1755BornChios
1780¹24.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 179742.4AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
1 Oct 180045.6AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
1 Feb 180145.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
12 Oct 181459.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
12 Oct 181459.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
26 Aug 181661.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
7 Mar 183580.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Binkentios Coressi:
Archbishop Binkentios Coressi (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 277, and Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013