Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria Blancis da CiriŤ, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Syros (e Milos)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1770BornCiriť, Italy
1795¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
26 Jul 182554.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Syros (e Milos), Greece
26 Jul 182554.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
6 Nov 182554.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
15 Mar 183059.2AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
21 Feb 184069.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Naxos, Greece
1844¹73.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Naxos, Greece
30 Oct 185180.8DiedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Blancis da CiriŤ (VIAF: 59829997)
Bishop Luigi Maria Blancis da CiriŤ O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Syros (e Milos)

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 130, and Page 277
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 356
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1825, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Jun 2016