Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolao Lorenzo Timoni

Deceased

Bishop of Chios (Scio)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1748¹BornScio
15 Sep 178840.7AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
22 Feb 178941.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
3 Jun 179648.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
3 Jun 179648.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
6 May 179951.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
6 May 179951.3ResignedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
18 Nov 181264.8DiedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Nicolao Lorenzo Timoni
Bishop Nicolao Lorenzo Timoni (born 1748, died ) Bishop of Chios (Scio)

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 164, and Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 455
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 149
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016