Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Boniface Choi Ki-San

Deceased

Bishop of Incheon {Inch’on}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1948BornKyeonki
6 Dec 197527.5Ordained PriestPriest of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)
29 Oct 199951.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)
27 Dec 199951.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)
25 Apr 200253.9SucceededBishop of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)
30 May 201668.0DiedBishop of Incheon {Inch’on}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Boniface Choi Ki-San
Bishop Boniface Choi Ki-San (born , died ) Bishop of Incheon {Inch’on}

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,658
  • d: CB, 30 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 May 2016