Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Landi

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567¹BornVeliternen
4 Jul 161245.5AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
29 Jul 161245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
12 Dec 1627³60.9DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Landi:
Bishop Lorenzo Landi (died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 190
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 53, Number 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013