Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Cattani

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1767BornModena
17 Sep 179023.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 182254.4SelectedBishop of Carpi, Italy
19 Apr 182254.7ConfirmedBishop of Carpi, Italy
14 Jul 182254.9Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
3 Jul 182658.9AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
7 Jan 184981.4DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Cattani
Bishop Filippo Cattani (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 135, and Page 320
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016