Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitale Loschi

Deceased

Bishop of Parma, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1756Born
11 Mar 178023.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 183174.2AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
24 Apr 183174.4Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
31 Dec 184286.0DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vitale Loschi
Bishop Vitale Loschi (born , died ) Bishop of Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalso Maggiore

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast