Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Esteban Catalá Ibáñez

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1949 BornVillamarchante
3 Jul 197626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
25 Mar 199646.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Mar 199646.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
11 May 199646.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urusi
27 Apr 199949.3AppointedBishop of Alcalá de Henares, Spain
10 Oct 200858.8AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
13 Dec 200859.0InstalledBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jesús Esteban Catalá Ibáñez:
Bishop Jesús Esteban Catalá Ibáñez (born ) Bishop of Málaga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Málaga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,749

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013