Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristóbal Bencomo Rodríguez

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1758Born
15 Nov 181759.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
11 Oct 181860.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
15 Apr 183576.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Bencomo Rodríguez
Archbishop Cristóbal Bencomo Rodríguez (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Laguna, Spain

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,224
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 137, Number 737
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast