Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Valernod

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1551Born
7 Jan 159846.6AppointedBishop of Nîmes, France
24 Feb 159846.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes, France
12 Sep 162574.2DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Valernod
Bishop Pierre de Valernod (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Vallier
Ordained BishopAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,368
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 255
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast