Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Séraphin Cardinal Olivier-Razali

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone

Cardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1538BornLyon, France
26 Aug 160264.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
15 Sep 160264.1Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
9 Jun 160465.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 160465.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
10 Feb 160970.5DiedCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro

MicroData Summary for Séraphin Olivier-Razali:
Séraphin Cardinal Olivier-Razali (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
  • a cardinal for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 76
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 39, Number 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015