Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Lombard

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹BornWaterford
1594²39.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 160146.5AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
7 Oct 160146.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
5 Sep 162570.6DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Lombard:
Archbishop Peter Lombard (died ) Archbishop of Armagh

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 38, Number 193
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015