Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Capone, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1829BornSalerno
24 Dec 184819.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Nov 1852³23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Dec 187344.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
22 Dec 187344.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Esbus
11 Jan 187444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Esbus
29 Jan 188353.4SucceededBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
22 Mar 190878.6DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Capone:
Bishop Raffaele Capone C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 263, and Page 396
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013