Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Achille Grimaldi

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1881Born
23 Sep 190524.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 192039.8AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
19 Mar 192140.1ResignedBishop-Elect of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Achille Grimaldi
Father Achille Grimaldi (born ) Former Bishop-Elect of Tricarico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAosta, Diocese of Aosta

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,921

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast