Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Capmany Casamitjana

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain

Titular Bishop of Casae Medianae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1920Born
19 Mar 194828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
22 Oct 196848.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
22 Oct 196848.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
14 Dec 196848.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
11 Sep 199171.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
20 Apr 199575.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Capmany Casamitjana
Bishop José Capmany Casamitjana (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSabadell
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Mar, Basilica, Barcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast