Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alsono Martín de Zuñiga (Manso)

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹BornCanillas
18 Jul 161647.5AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
20 Mar 162354.2AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
21 Jun 163061.4DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alsono Martín de Zuñiga (Manso):
Bishop Alsono Martín de Zuñiga (Manso) (born 1569, died ) Bishop of Osma

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,827
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 268
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 134, Number 855
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015