Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Cossa

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1607AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
29 Apr 1607Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
1618²DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mario Cossa
Bishop Mario Cossa (died 1618) Bishop of Montalcino

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 32
  • ob/c2+: AT, 16 Jul 2016
  • c4: AT, 18 Jul 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,970

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Sep 2016