Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Etienne Soukkarie

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)

Titular Archbishop of Myra dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1868Born
1891²22.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 192051.5AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
25 Apr 192051.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra dei Greco-Melkiti
25 Apr 192051.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra dei Greco-Melkiti
25 Nov 192153.1DiedPatriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Etienne Soukkarie
Archbishop Etienne Soukkarie (born , died ) Patriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018