Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melèce Abou Assaly (Assaleh)

Deceased

Bishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1880BornRasayya al-Wadi
1906²25.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 192241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
5 Jun 192241.6SelectedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
9 Jun 192241.6InstalledBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
11 Dec 192242.1ConfirmedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
20 Jun 193756.6DiedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melèce Abou Assaly (Assaleh):
Bishop Melèce Abou Assaly (Assaleh) (born , died ) Bishop of Baalbek

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013