Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Butler

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1815Born
26 Nov 183823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
18 Jun 186146.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Limerick, Ireland
18 Jun 186146.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
25 Jul 186348.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
6 Jun 186449.3SucceededBishop of Limerick, Ireland
3 Feb 188670.9DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for George Butler
Bishop George Butler (born , died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick
Ordained BishopSt. John, Cathedral, Limerick, Diocese of Limerick

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Website of the Diocese
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 81, and Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017