Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Martin Aloysius Burke

Deceased

Bishop of Albany, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1840Born
30 Jun 186424.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 189454.3AppointedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
1 Jul 189454.4Ordained BishopBishop of Albany, New York, USA
20 Jan 191575.0DiedBishop of Albany, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Martin Aloysius Burke
Bishop Thomas Martin Aloysius Burke (born , died ) Bishop of Albany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSwinford, Ireland
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Albany, Diocese of Albany, New York

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast