Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Anton Brinkmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Oropus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1796Born
29 Jan 182124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
15 Mar 185255.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
15 Mar 185255.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
16 May 185255.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oropus
7 May 185659.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Anton Brinkmann (VIAF: 220896131)
Bishop Georg Anton Brinkmann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBillerbeck
Ordained BishopCathedral, Münster, Diocese of Münster

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 428
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast