Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Bonner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500Born
1519²19.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 153838.9AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
20 Oct 153939.8AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
4 Apr 154040.2Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
1 Apr 154949.2ResignedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
5 Sep 155353.6AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
30 May 155959.4ResignedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
5 Sep 156969.6DiedBishop Emeritus of London, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Bonner (VIAF: 69270288)
Bishop Edmund Bonner (born 1500, died ) Bishop Emeritus of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHanley, Worcestershire, Diocese of London, England
Death PlaceMarshalsea, Prison, Southwark, Diocese of London, England

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 300
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 228
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 5
  • op/loc: CB, 10 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast