Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Thirlby

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500Born
154040.0AppointedBishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
19 Dec 154040.9Ordained BishopBishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
1 Apr 155050.2AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
21 Jun 155454.4AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
5 Jul 155959.5ResignedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
26 Aug 157070.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Thirlby
Bishop Thomas Thirlby (born 1500, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ely

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHenry VII, Chapel, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 469
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast